NV SB189 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes concerning the collection of information relating to the treatment of trauma. (BDR 40-95)
Title
Makes various changes concerning the collection of information relating to the treatment of trauma. (BDR 40-95)
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] | Sen. Richard Segerblom [D] |
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Ruben Kihuen [D] | Sen. Mark Manendo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |