NV SB188 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions prohibiting certain discriminatory acts. (BDR 18-106)
Title
Revises provisions prohibiting certain discriminatory acts. (BDR 18-106)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 197. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |