NV SB187 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to prescription drugs; revising requirements concerning the issuance of certain prescriptions for a controlled substance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing prescriptions for controlled substances by a dentist, optometrist or physician for the treatment of pain. (BDR 54-39)
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Pickard [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Sen. Scott Hammond [R] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] |
Sen. Robin Titus [R] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 406.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |