NV SB187 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for the establishment of a fine arts museum in Las Vegas, Nevada, and the expansion of the Nevada Museum of Art in Reno, Nevada. (BDR S-267)
Title
Makes an appropriation for the establishment of a fine arts museum in Las Vegas, Nevada, and the expansion of the Nevada Museum of Art in Reno, Nevada. (BDR S-267)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 454. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1094.) |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 176.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-05 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |