NV SB186 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to the provision of information and assistance to immigrants. (BDR 18-280)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the provision of information and assistance to immigrants. (BDR 18-280)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2017-04-10SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
2017-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-03-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback