NV SB183 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to the Nevada Transportation Authority. (BDR 58-717)
Title
Makes various changes relating to the Nevada Transportation Authority. (BDR 58-717)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 403.) To printer. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |