NV SB181 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcohol and drug counselors; revising the requirements for the completion of postgraduate counseling for certain licenses for alcohol and drug counselors; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to alcohol and drug counselors. (BDR 54-558)
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Sen. Keith Pickard [R] | Sen. Carrie Buck [R] |
Sen. Robin Titus [R] | Rep. Gregory Hafen [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 170. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 106.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |