NV SB180 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a court to award certain relief to an employee injured by certain unlawful employment practices under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-561)
Title
Requires a court to award certain relief to an employee injured by certain unlawful employment practices under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-561)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 14, Excused: 4.) To Senate. |
2013-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |