NV SB18 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to bail bonds. (BDR 57-464)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to bail bonds. (BDR 57-464)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 369.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-06SenateRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-23SenateFrom printer.
2016-11-16SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback