NV SB179 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Assembly Amendment No. 701 concurred in. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to abortions; revising provisions relating to informed consent to an abortion; repealing criminal penalties on certain actions relating to the termination of a pregnancy; repealing the prohibition on the excusal of a person on certain grounds from testifying as a witness in a prosecution relating to the termination of a pregnancy; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to abortions. (BDR 40-567)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateAssembly Amendment No. 701 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-22SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 13, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 701.) To printer.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 136.) To printer.
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback