NV SB173 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; revising provisions relating to vacating a judgment of conviction and sealing certain records of a victim of sex trafficking or involuntary servitude; revising provisions relating to the filing of a petition for the sealing of records of criminal history; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to criminal convictions of victims of sex trafficking and involuntary servitude. (BDR 14-595)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 77.
2019-05-14SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-13SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 379.) To printer.
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback