NV SB168 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to energy; revising provisions governing energy conservation and energy efficiency standards for residences with an on-site renewable energy system; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to energy efficiency standards for buildings. (BDR 58-912)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6264/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB168.pdf |