NV SB167 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes an appropriation for the creation and maintenance of school gardens. (BDR S-834)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes an appropriation for the creation and maintenance of school gardens. (BDR S-834)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 452.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateTo printer.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.)
2017-06-03SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1093.)
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-18SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 114.)
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-03-01SenateRe-referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-03-01SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Education.
2017-02-28SenateNotice of exemption.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=418
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB167.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB167_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB167_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB167_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1303&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=167&fldBillname=SB167
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1439&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=167&fldBillname=SB167
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1303&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=24&fldBillname=SB24
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1439&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=24&fldBillname=SB24

Bill Comments 750

feedback