NV SB167 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to employment. (BDR 18-265)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to employment. (BDR 18-265)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-16Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2015-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 275.) To printer.
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-17SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback