NV SB167 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 188.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the release of certain reports of the abuse or neglect of children. (BDR 38-246)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the release of certain reports of the abuse or neglect of children. (BDR 38-246)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-01 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 188.
2011-05-27 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-05-25 To enrollment.
2011-05-25 In Senate.
2011-05-23 Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2011-05-20 Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-20 Taken from General File.
2011-05-19 Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-19 Taken from General File.
2011-05-18 Read second time.
2011-05-18 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-05-18 From committee: Do pass.
2011-04-15 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2011-04-15 In Assembly.
2011-04-14 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2011-04-11 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-08 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-04-07 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 35.) To printer.
2011-04-06 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-02-18 From printer. To committee.
2011-02-17 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback