NV SB164 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; clarifying that certain virtual currencies are intangible personal property for the purposes of taxation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes certain virtual currencies as a form of intangible personal property for purposes of taxation. (BDR 32-878)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateChapter 476.
2019-06-07SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 152.) To printer.
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback