NV SB163 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to business entities; revising the definition of electronic transmission as it relates to certain communications of certain business entities to include the use of a blockchain; authorizing certain business entities to store certain records on a blockchain; revising provisions authorizing the Secretary of State to adopt regulations to define certain terms to allow certain business entities to carry out their powers and duties using the most recent technology available to include the use of blockchains; revising the definition of blockchain to include a public blockchain; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to technology used by certain business entities. (BDR 7-877)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateChapter 475.
2019-06-07SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 2, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-24AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-24AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-20AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-20AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 293.) To printer.
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback