NV SB163 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Advisory Council on Nevada Wildlife Conservation and Education within the Department of Wildlife. (BDR 45-616)
Title
Creates the Advisory Council on Nevada Wildlife Conservation and Education within the Department of Wildlife. (BDR 45-616)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 946.) To printer. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 181.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |