NV SB161 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing product liability. (BDR 3-949)
Title
Revises provisions governing product liability. (BDR 3-949)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 87.) To printer. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |