NV SB159 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising provisions relating to school uniforms; requiring each public school and private school to adopt a policy concerning safe exposure to the sun; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires each public school and private school to adopt a policy concerning safe exposure to the sun. (BDR 34-583)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 99. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |