NV SB152 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
Summary
Enacts the Green Jobs Initiative. (BDR 58-172)
Title
Enacts the Green Jobs Initiative. (BDR 58-172)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 778 and 953 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-28 | To printer. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-28 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 953.) | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-22 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-05-22 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-22 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-21 | To Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 778.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-08 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) To printer. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-16 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-02-20 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=413 |