NV SB151 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 600.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 600.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property; removing and revising certain provisions relating to actions for summary eviction; reorganizing procedures for summary eviction of a tenant of a commercial premise; revising provisions governing notices to surrender possession of real property or a mobile home; limiting the amount of fees for the late payment of rent; requiring a landlord to allow a former tenant to retrieve essential personal effects and establishing an expedited procedure if a landlord acts unreasonably under such circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to certain proceedings concerning property. (BDR 3-516)
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Ratti [D] | Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] |
Sen. Chris Brooks [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 600. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fifth reprint. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | (Conference Amend. No. CA6.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 and further amend. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 780.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 635.) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |