NV SB151 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to adopt regulations authorizing a natural gas utility to expand its infrastructure in a manner consistent with a program of economic development. (BDR 58-52)
Title
Requires the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to adopt regulations authorizing a natural gas utility to expand its infrastructure in a manner consistent with a program of economic development. (BDR 58-52)
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] | Sen. Ruben Kihuen [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] | Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Kirkpatrick [D] | Rep. Michael Sprinkle [D] | Rep. Maggie Carlton [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 59. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 66.) To printer. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |