NV SB150 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 283.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 283.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to housing; requiring the governing body of a city or county to authorize tiny houses in certain zoning districts; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes changes to provisions relating to housing. (BDR 22-221)
Sponsors
Sen. Dallas Harris [D] | Sen. Fabian Donate [D] | Sen. Carrie Buck [R] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] |
Sen. Roberta Lange [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 283. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 715 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Absent: 1.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 715.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 164.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |