NV SB150 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 591.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions related to energy efficiency programs. (BDR 58-568)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to energy efficiency programs. (BDR 58-568)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 591.
2017-06-05SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 5, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-19AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-19AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-19AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 255.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback