NV SB146 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - From committee: Do pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mental health; requiring certain psychiatric facilities to consult with the treating provider of health care of a child with an emotional disturbance who is subject to the jurisdiction of a juvenile court under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to mental health services for children. (BDR 39-870)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2021-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 446.) To printer.
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-02-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback