NV SB146 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising provisions relating to the Silver State Opportunity Grant Program; changing the credit hour requirement for eligibility in the Program; requiring the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Board of Regents to include additional information in its biennial report on the Program to the Legislature; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises the eligibility requirements for the Silver State Opportunity Grant. (BDR 34-385)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6183/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB146.pdf |