NV SB146 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the filing of an integrated resources plan with the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada. (BDR 58-15)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the filing of an integrated resources plan with the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada. (BDR 58-15)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 590.
2017-06-05SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 4, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-18AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2017-05-18AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 578.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-04-24SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-04-24SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-04-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 254.) To printer.
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback