NV SB144 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 548.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-300)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-300)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 548.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-06SenateTo enrollment.
2017-06-06SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-05SenateTo printer.
2017-06-05Senate(Conference Amend. No. CA6.)
2017-06-05SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 892 and further amend.
2017-06-04SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2017-06-04SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 892 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-30SenateAssembly Amendment No. 892 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 15, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 892.) To printer.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 517.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback