NV SB143 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each public school in a school district to establish and maintain a school library. (BDR 34-59)
Title
Requires each public school in a school district to establish and maintain a school library. (BDR 34-59)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 244.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |