NV SB140 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; authorizing a board of county commissioners in certain smaller counties to apply to the Department of Taxation for reimbursement of costs incurred by the county for certain activities provided by a tax-exempt organization or nonprofit corporation that are subject to the excise tax on live entertainment; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain counties to obtain reimbursement of costs incurred for certain activities that are subject to the excise tax on live entertainment. (BDR 32-166)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2023-04-26SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2023-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer.
2023-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 507.) Taken from General File.
2023-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-06SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2023-02-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-02-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback