NV SB140 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the residential confinement or other appropriate supervision of certain older offenders. (BDR 16-798)
Title
Authorizes the residential confinement or other appropriate supervision of certain older offenders. (BDR 16-798)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-03 | Senate | No further consideration. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Bill read. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, June 3, 2017, at 11:15 a.m. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 212.) To printer. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Taken from General File for next legislative day. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 82.) To printer. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |