NV SB138 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of a local improvement district for a waterfront maintenance project. (BDR 22-678)
Title
Authorizes the creation of a local improvement district for a waterfront maintenance project. (BDR 22-678)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 358. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 67.) To printer. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |