NV SB137 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing certain plans, programs and reports relating to veterans. (BDR 37-64)
Title
Revises provisions governing certain plans, programs and reports relating to veterans. (BDR 37-64)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 357. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 214.) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |