NV SB135 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that an applicant for certain insurance-related licenses have the option to take an examination in Spanish. (BDR 57-684)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that an applicant for certain insurance-related licenses have the option to take an examination in Spanish. (BDR 57-684)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2017-04-10SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-10SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-07SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-07SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 95.)
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-28SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback