NV SB133 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; prohibiting a person from creating or serving in a false slate of presidential electors or conspiring to create or serve in a false slate of presidential electors; prohibiting the State or a local government from appointing to public office or employing a person convicted of such an offense; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to presidential electors. (BDR 24-539)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | No further consideration. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 5, 2023, at 11:15 A.M. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 483.) To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |