NV SB131 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82. (Effective May 30, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to reproductive health care; prohibiting health care licensing boards from disqualifying from licensure or disciplining a person for providing or assisting in the provision of certain reproductive health care services; prohibiting the Governor from surrendering, or issuing an arrest warrant for, a person who is charged in another state with a criminal violation related to certain reproductive health care services; prohibiting state agencies from assisting in certain investigations and proceedings initiated in other states related to certain reproductive health care services; requiring certain health care licensing boards to examine the feasibility of reciprocal licensure for health care providers who provide reproductive health care services in other states; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to reproductive health care. (BDR 54-44)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 82. (Effective May 30, 2023)
2023-05-25SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2023-05-19AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-04-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2023-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2023-04-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-04-17SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-04-13SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-04-11SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-04-10SenateRead second time.
2023-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-02-10SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-02-09SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback