NV SB130 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 435.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to radiation; creating the Radiation Therapy and Radiologic Imaging Advisory Committee; providing for a license to engage in radiation therapy or radiologic imaging; providing for a limited license to engage in radiologic imaging; prescribing the requirements for the issuance and renewal of such a license and limited license; authorizing certain persons to practice as radiologist assistants; prescribing additional qualifications for a person to perform certain types of radiation therapy and radiologic imaging; providing for the enforcement of the requirements concerning radiation therapy and radiologic imaging; authorizing the imposition of disciplinary action or an injunction against a person who engages in radiation therapy or radiologic imaging in certain circumstances; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the licensing and regulation of certain persons who administer radiation. (BDR 40-61)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 435.
2019-06-02SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-31SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-30AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 873.) To printer.
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 60.)
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-07SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-06SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback