NV SB128 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to occupational licensing boards; revising provisions governing the registration by the Nevada State Board of Accountancy of partnerships, corporations, limited-liability companies and sole proprietorships; requiring the Board of Medical Examiners to report certain additional licensure information; requiring members of the Nevada Physical Therapy Board to attend certain training; providing for the issuance of a provisional license as an instructor in the practice of barbering; requiring the State Board of Cosmetology to adopt regulations to provide for the issuance of an endorsement to render shaving services on certain licenses; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the administration of occupational licensing boards. (BDR 54-518)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateTo printer.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
2019-04-23SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 514.)
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 486.) To printer.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2019-02-04SenateFrom printer.
2019-02-01SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback