NV SB127 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 206.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 206.
Summary
Exempts qualified persons or groups providing construction oversight services to a long-term recovery group from regulation as a contractor. (BDR 54-596)
Title
Exempts qualified persons or groups providing construction oversight services to a long-term recovery group from regulation as a contractor. (BDR 54-596)
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Amodei [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 206. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-17 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 489.) To printer. | |
2009-04-17 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-13 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2009-04-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-12 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=323 |