NV SB124 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2. (Effective February 27, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; revising the manner by which a portion of the revenue generated by the tax upon the net proceeds of minerals and royalties of mining operations is distributed to the State Education Fund; revising provisions relating to the transfer of money to the Education Stabilization Account in the State Education Fund; clarifying the treatment of the proceeds of such a tax within a county school district fund; clarifying the status of the money contained in such a fund on a certain date; providing for the early expiration of certain requirements regarding the imposition and advance payment of a portion of the tax upon the net proceeds of minerals and royalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the tax upon the net proceeds of minerals and royalties of mining operations. (BDR 32-908)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 2. (Effective February 27, 2023)
2023-02-27SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-02-23SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 2 and 3 concurred in. To enrollment.
2023-02-23SenateIn Senate.
2023-02-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate.
2023-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2023-02-23AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 3.) To printer.
2023-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2023-02-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 2.) To printer.
2023-02-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2023-02-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-02-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
2023-02-14SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-02-14SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-02-13SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1.) To printer.
2023-02-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-02-09SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-02-08SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/9773/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB124.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB124_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB124_R2.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB124_R3.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB124_EN.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/Amendments/A_SB124_1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/Amendments/A_SB124_R1_2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/Amendments/A_SB124_R2_3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=9579&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=9584&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments

feedback