NV SB122 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 55.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to occupational safety; requiring certain employees of a cannabis establishment to receive certain health and safety training; requiring a cannabis establishment to suspend or terminate the employment of an employee who fails to complete such training; providing administrative penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain health and safety training for certain employees of cannabis establishments. (BDR 53-663)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateChapter 55.
2021-05-25SenateApproved by the Governor.
2021-05-21SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-18SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2021-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead second time.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2021-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 46.) To printer.
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-02-16SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-15SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback