NV SB121 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning issues regarding the behavioral and cognitive care needs of older persons. (BDR S-63)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning issues regarding the behavioral and cognitive care needs of older persons. (BDR S-63)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 522.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-04SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2017-04-13SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-12SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-12SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 125.)
2017-04-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of exemption.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback