NV SB120 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to problem gambling. (BDR 40-810)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to problem gambling. (BDR 40-810)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 521.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-01SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-31SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1032.) To printer.
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-07SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
2017-03-07SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-02-28SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
2017-02-13SenatePrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback