NV SB119 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to occupational safety; requiring certain workers performing work at sites where certain exhibitions, conventions or trade shows occur to receive certain health and safety training; providing administrative penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires certain health and safety training for workers and supervisors performing certain work at sites where exhibitions, conventions or trade shows occur. (BDR 53-570)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 59.) To printer. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |