NV SB119 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to educational facilities. (BDR 28-732)
Title
Revises provisions relating to educational facilities. (BDR 28-732)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.) To Senate. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | From printer. |
2015-02-01 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |