NV SB119 | 2009 | 75th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.

Summary

Revises provisions governing massage therapists. (BDR 54-162)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing massage therapists. (BDR 54-162)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-04 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.
2009-06-02 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2009-06-01 To enrollment.
2009-06-01 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
2009-06-01 To printer.
2009-05-31 Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2009-05-30 Conference report adopted by Senate.
2009-05-30 From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 777 and 936 and further amend.
2009-05-28 Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2009-05-28 In Senate.
2009-05-27 Assembly Amendment Nos. 777 and 936 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2009-05-27 In Assembly.
2009-05-26 Assembly Amendment Nos. 777 and 936 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2009-05-23 In Senate.
2009-05-23 To Senate.
2009-05-23 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2009-05-22 To printer.
2009-05-22 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
2009-05-22 Dispensed with reprinting.
2009-05-22 Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 936.)
2009-05-22 Placed on General File.
2009-05-22 Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2009-05-22 Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
2009-05-22 Taken from General File.
2009-05-22 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2009-05-21 To printer.
2009-05-21 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 777.)
2009-05-21 Placed on Second Reading File.
2009-05-21 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-04-22 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2009-04-22 In Assembly.
2009-04-21 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2009-04-21 Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2009-04-21 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2009-04-21 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 221.) To printer.
2009-04-21 Placed on Second Reading File.
2009-04-21 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-02-06 From printer. To committee.
2009-02-05 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback