NV SB111 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the use of portable event recording devices by certain peace officers employed by the Nevada Highway Patrol Division of the Department of Public Safety. (BDR 43-618)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the use of portable event recording devices by certain peace officers employed by the Nevada Highway Patrol Division of the Department of Public Safety. (BDR 43-618)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 533.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2015-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1027.) To printer.
2015-05-31SenatePlaced on General File.
2015-05-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-10SenateExemption effective.
2015-04-10SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2015-04-09SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2015-04-09SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 357.)
2015-04-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-04-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2015-04-06SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee: Without recommendation and re-refer to the Committee on Finance.
2015-02-02SenateRead first time. To committee.
2015-02-02SenateFrom printer.
2015-02-01SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback