NV SB11 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; authorizing certain incorporated cities to impose a supplemental governmental services tax based on the valuation of a vehicle; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes certain incorporated cities to impose a supplemental governmental services tax. (BDR 32-433)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7186/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB11.pdf |