NV SB103 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 351.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 351.
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Public Employees' Benefits Program. (BDR 23-422)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Public Employees' Benefits Program. (BDR 23-422)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 351. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-22 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 374.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=204 |